Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0848040

EP0848040 - Method of producing metal-free phthalocyanine with a control of the produced modification [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1998/25]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schütze, Andrea Birgit, Dr.
Lindwurmgasse 10
67547 Worms / DE
02 / Scherhag, Frank, Dr.
Mühlweg 45
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
03 / Klopp, Ingo, Dr.
Neustadter Strasse 6
67245 Lambsheim / DE
04 / Hartmann, Anette
Marktstrasse 70
67489 Kirrweiler / DE
[1998/25]
Application number, filing date97122066.015.12.1997
[1998/25]
Priority number, dateDE199615224116.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19652241
[1998/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0848040
Date:17.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0848040
Date:21.10.1998
[1998/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0848040
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C09B47/30, C09B67/50
[1998/25]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1999/26]
Former [1998/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von metallfreiem Phthalocyanin unter Steuerung der gebildeten Modifikation[1998/25]
English:Method of producing metal-free phthalocyanine with a control of the produced modification[1998/25]
French:Procédé de fabrication de phtalocyanine non métallisée permettant le contrôle de la modification formée[1998/25]
Examination procedure09.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
22.04.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.08.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
10.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2002Fee for grant paid
06.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Request for further processing for:21.08.2001Request for further processing filed
21.08.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.10.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.05.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999DK   M02   Not yet paid
21.05.1999ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.05.1999SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DY]EP0658604  (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR2364954  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, paragraph L *;
 [A]FR2321527  (CIBA GEIGY AG [GB]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - line 14; examples 7-10 * * page 5, line 12 - line 33 *;
 [A]EP0570750  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 2 - line 28 *;
 [A]FR2307022  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 20; examples 10,47,48,105 *;
 [A]FR2372870  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0093331  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *