Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0849424

EP0849424 - Vehicle door lock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
D. LA PORTE SÖHNE GMBH
Wartburgstrasse 21
42285 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
D. La Porte Söhne GmbH
Wartburgstrasse 21
42285 Wuppertal / DE
Former [1998/26]For all designated states
D. La Porte Söhne GmbH
Wartburgstrasse 21
D-42283 Wuppertal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kutschat, Horst
Breite Strasse 101
42369 Wuppertal / DE
[1998/26]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
42103 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
D-42103 Wuppertal / DE
Former [1998/26]Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
42103 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date97122200.516.12.1997
[1998/26]
Priority number, dateDE199615316919.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19653169
[1998/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0849424
Date:24.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0849424
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:E05B65/32
[1998/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1999/10]
Former [1998/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugtürschloss[1998/26]
English:Vehicle door lock[1998/26]
French:Serrure de porte de véhicule[1998/26]
Examination procedure16.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/38]
16.07.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
02.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
29.12.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
25.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2000Fee for grant paid
20.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99108978.0  / EP0936332
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.01.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999FR   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.01.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE1953184  (ATWOOD VACUUM MACHINE CO) [X] 1,2,4,8,15,16,19,22,27,30,37 * the whole document * [A] 3,4,23 [Y] 17,18,20,21,25,26;
 [YA]GB2045336  (SETEC) [Y] 17,18,20,21,25,26 * the whole document * [A] 1-3;
 [XA]US3666305  (SCHLICHTER WILLIAM L) [X] 1,2,4,15,16,19,22-24,27,30,33,40 * the whole document * [A] 5,46;
 [A]US3231302  (WESTERDALE MAURICE M);
 [A]US4763934  (KAVENEY JR JOHN R [US])