Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0848926

EP0848926 - Telescopic dust suction tube for a vacuum cleaner incorporating an electrically conducting cable [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fischer-Rohrtechnik GmbH
Gewerbegebiet 7
77855 Achern-Fautenbach / DE
For all designated states
Miele & Cie. GmbH & Co.
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
D-33332 Gütersloh / DE
[1998/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Cordes, August
3, Unterm Krähenberg
59846 Sundern / DE
02 / Brinkhoff, Helmut
27, Grünstrasse
33824 Werther / DE
03 / Gloning, Gunter
65, Lerchenstrasse
33607 Bielefeld / DE
04 / Hettenhausen, Ulrich
8, Enzianweg
33739 Bielefeld / DE
[1998/26]
Representative(s)Eichelbaum, Lambert
Krüppeleichen 6
45659 Recklinghausen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]Eichelbaum, Lambert, Dipl.-Ing.
Krüppeleichen 6
45659 Recklinghausen / DE
Application number, filing date97122231.017.12.1997
[1998/26]
Priority number, dateDE199615264718.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19652647
[1998/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0848926
Date:24.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0848926
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:A47L9/24, A47L9/28
[1998/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/26]
TitleGerman:Teleskopierbares Staubsauger-Saugrohr mit einem darin angeordneten, elektrisch leitenden Kabel[1998/26]
English:Telescopic dust suction tube for a vacuum cleaner incorporating an electrically conducting cable[1998/26]
French:Tuyau téléscopique d'aspirateur comprenant un câble électrique[1998/26]
Examination procedure03.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
19.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.06.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2000Fee for grant paid
13.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
DK11.07.2001
PT11.07.2001
GR13.07.2001
LU17.12.2001
MC17.12.2001
BE31.12.2001
[2005/01]
Former [2004/39]FI11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
DK11.07.2001
PT11.07.2001
LU17.12.2001
MC17.12.2001
BE31.12.2001
Former [2003/46]FI11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
DK11.07.2001
PT11.07.2001
MC17.12.2001
BE31.12.2001
Former [2003/06]FI11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
MC17.12.2001
BE31.12.2001
Former [2002/48]FI11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
MC17.12.2001
Former [2002/43]FI11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
MC17.12.2001
Former [2002/27]FI11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
Former [2002/15]FI11.04.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0738492  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 7, line 4 - line 53; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JPH04189337  ;
 [AD]DE4404394  (BERGHAENEL DIETMAR DIPL ING [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 2 - line 41; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]DE1921410  (CONS FOODS CORP) [AD] 1 * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 14; figures 10-14 *;
 [AD]DE4402835  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921021), vol. 016, no. 509, Database accession no. (C - 0997), [A] 1 * abstract *