EP0850997 - Filled addition curable compositions having reduced gassing and increased shelf stability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalinowski, Robert Edward 4426 S. Nine Mile Road Auburn, Michigan 48611 / US | 02 /
Tomalia, Mary Kay 1276 Patterson Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122481.1 | 19.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | US19960773745 | 24.12.1996 Original published format: US 773745 | US19970984359 | 03.12.1997 Original published format: US 984359 | [1998/32] |
Former [1998/27] | US19960773745 | 24.12.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0850997 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0850997 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C08K7/00, C08K3/34, C08K5/54, C08K3/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/26, C08K3/36 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
C08K3/34 (EP);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08K3/01 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K3/26 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP);
C08K5/541 (KR);
C08L101/02 (KR);
C08K2003/265 (EP);
C08L23/22 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/01, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08K3/26, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08K3/34, C08L83/04 (EP); |
Former IPC [1998/27] | C08L83/04, C08K7/00, C08K3/34, C08K5/54 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/49] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gefüllte additionshärtbare Zusammensetzungen mit verminderter Ausgasung und verbesserter Lagerbeständigkeit | [1998/27] | English: | Filled addition curable compositions having reduced gassing and increased shelf stability | [1998/27] | French: | Compositions chargées, durcissables par polyaddition ayant un dévéloppement de gazes réduit et une stabilité de conservation améliorée | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/25] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.10.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4499230 (LOCKHART THOMAS P [US]) [A] 1,10 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4499229 (LOCKHART THOMAS P [US]) [A] 1,10 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0577276 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1,4,7-10 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 9 * * page 2, line 34 - line 35 * * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 23; example -; claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0596677 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,8,10 * example .; claims 1,4,5,8,9 *; | [X]EP0597613 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,8,10 * page 5, line 40 - line 49; example 5; claims 1,4,6,7 *; | [AD]US5409995 (IWAHARA TAKAHISA [JP], et al) [AD] 1-11* claim - * |