blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0855205

EP0855205 - Filter for liquids containing contaminants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstrasse 54
70376 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/03]
Former [1998/31]For all designated states
KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH
Pragstrasse 54
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Geisbauer, Heinz
In der Heid 15
74629 Untersteinbach / DE
[1998/31]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Bongen, Renaud & Partner
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/31]Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Rotermund + Pfusch
Waiblinger Strasse 11
D-70372 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97122608.922.12.1997
[1998/31]
Priority number, dateDE199615466628.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19654666
[1998/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0855205
Date:29.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0855205
Date:02.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.1998
ClassificationIPC:B01D1/00, B01D29/68
[1998/31]
CPC:
B01D29/15 (EP); B01D29/682 (EP); B01D29/688 (EP);
B01D29/70 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/15]
Former [1998/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Filter für Verunreinigungen enthaltende Flüssigkeiten[1998/31]
English:Filter for liquids containing contaminants[1998/31]
French:Filtre pour liquides contenant des contaminants[2002/48]
Former [1998/31]Filtre pour liquides contenants des contaminants
Examination procedure23.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/39]
28.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2003Fee for grant paid
22.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI02.04.2003
IT02.04.2003
NL02.04.2003
SE02.07.2003
AT22.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
CH31.12.2003
LI31.12.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2005/22]FI02.04.2003
NL02.04.2003
SE02.07.2003
AT22.12.2003
BE31.12.2003
CH31.12.2003
LI31.12.2003
Former [2005/01]FI02.04.2003
NL02.04.2003
SE02.07.2003
BE31.12.2003
CH31.12.2003
LI31.12.2003
Former [2004/51]FI02.04.2003
NL02.04.2003
SE02.07.2003
CH31.12.2003
LI31.12.2003
Former [2004/05]FI02.04.2003
NL02.04.2003
SE02.07.2003
Former [2004/01]NL02.04.2003
SE02.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE02.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1485989  (PLENTY GROUP LTD) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,2,4; claims 1,7 *;
 [A]GB2232903  (JACKSON MARK DAVID) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4320952  (MAURER UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,4-6; claims 1-4,14 *;
 [AD]DE4400485  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.