blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0853172 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0853172



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 116
14.09.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
30.09.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.08.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.08.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
03.08.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.05.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.05.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
13.05.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.05.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.05.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
16.04.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.04.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
07.02.2004 Description Search / examination 7
07.02.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.02.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
16.09.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.08.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.08.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.08.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
24.04.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.03.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.11.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
03.08.2000 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
03.09.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.08.1998 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
06.08.1998 Representative's authorisation terminated Search / examination 2
25.07.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.05.1998 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
27.05.1998 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
02.05.1998 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
05.02.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.02.1998 Priority document Search / examination 13
31.12.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.12.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
31.12.1997 Description Search / examination 6
31.12.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.12.1997 Drawings Search / examination 3
31.12.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6