blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0853172


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2008  [2008/07]
30.06.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2006  [2006/31]
04.11.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2005  [2005/51]
30.09.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
16.09.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.11.2005  [2005/44]
20.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2005  [2005/27]
13.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.06.2005  [2005/26]
24.09.2004 (Expected) grant published on  10.11.2004  [2004/46]
13.08.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.08.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.05.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.02.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.01.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.12.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.09.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.08.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.04.2003 Examination report or reply
18.04.2003 First examination report
20.12.2002 Renewal fee
12.12.2001 Renewal fee
13.02.2001 Loss of particular rights
14.12.2000 Renewal fee
07.11.2000 Loss of particular rights
25.09.2000 Change - extension states
31.07.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
28.07.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  13.09.2000 [2000/37]
11.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  29.03.2000 [2000/13]
17.12.1999 Renewal fee
19.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
02.10.1998 Change - representative published on  18.11.1998 [1998/47]
07.08.1998 Change - representative published on  23.09.1998 [1998/39]
29.05.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.07.1998 [1998/29]