blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0853172
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59712071D 16.12.2004D1
Priority number Date
DE59712071 31.12.1997
DE19700757 11.01.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0853172Global Dossier 10.11.2004B1
EP0853172 05.01.2000A3
EP0853172 15.07.1998A2
Priority number Date
DE19700757 11.01.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT282121T 15.11.2004T
Priority number Date
DE19700757 11.01.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19700757 14.09.2000C2
DE19700757 23.07.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19700757 11.01.1997