Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0853172

EP0853172 - Sun protecting arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weinor, Die Markise, Dieter Weiermann GmbH & Co.
Mathias-Brüggen-Strasse 110
50829 Köln (Ostendorf) / DE
[1998/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Merkel, Rudolf
Schillerstrasse 5
91083 Baiersdorf / DE
[1998/29]
Representative(s)Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Postfach 14 01 61
40071 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Postfach 14 01 61
40071 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1998/39](deleted)
...
Former [1998/29]Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date97123025.531.12.1997
[1998/29]
Priority number, dateDE199710075711.01.1997         Original published format: DE 19700757
[1998/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0853172
Date:15.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0853172
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853172
Date:10.11.2004
Language:DE
[2004/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:E04F10/00
[1998/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/37]
Former [1998/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sonnenschutzanlage[1998/29]
English:Sun protecting arrangement[1998/29]
French:Arrangement para-soleil[1998/29]
Examination procedure26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
06.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
24.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2004Fee for grant paid
03.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR10.11.2004
IT10.11.2004
BE31.12.2004
DK10.02.2005
GR10.02.2005
ES21.02.2005
[2008/07]
Former [2006/31]FR10.11.2004
BE31.12.2004
DK10.02.2005
GR10.02.2005
ES21.02.2005
Former [2005/51]BE31.12.2004
DK10.02.2005
GR10.02.2005
ES21.02.2005
Former [2005/46]DK10.02.2005
GR10.02.2005
ES21.02.2005
Former [2005/27]GR10.02.2005
ES21.02.2005
Former [2005/26]GR10.02.2005
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0545062  (WEINOR DIETER WEIERMANN) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE8524022U  (WEINOR DIETER WEIERMANN) [A] 1 * page 11, paragraph 2; figure 4 *;
 [A]DE9311755U  (WAREMA RENKHOFF) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5186231  (M. LEWIS) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 37-60; figure 1 *