Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0791857

EP0791857 - Imaging element comprising a two-phase layer having a disperse hydrophobic photopolymerisable phase [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 10.04.2002  [2002/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT N.V.
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Former [1997/35]For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Inventor(s)01 / van Damme, Marc
c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
02 / Vermeersch, Joan
c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
03 / Podszun, Wolfgang
Roggendorfstrasse 55
51061 Köln / DE
04 / Lui, Norbert
Roggendorfstrasse 55
51061 Köln / DE
[1997/35]
Application number, filing date97200352.910.02.1997
[1997/35]
Priority number, dateEP1996020048226.02.1996         Original published format: EP 96200482
[1997/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0791857
Date:27.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0791857
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/027
[1997/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/35]
TitleGerman:Bildaufzeichnungselement, das eine Zweiphasenbeschichtung mit einer dispergierten hydrophoben photopolymerisierbaren Phase enthält[1997/35]
English:Imaging element comprising a two-phase layer having a disperse hydrophobic photopolymerisable phase[1997/35]
French:Elément pour l'enregistrement d'images comprenant une couche à deux phases dont la phase dispersée est hydrophobe et photopolymérisable[1997/35]
Examination procedure27.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/18]
09.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2000Fee for grant paid
01.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB15.02.2001
[2002/15]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9200552  (COATES BROTHERS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-9 * page 13 - page 14; example 4 *;
 [A]EP0092782  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 15 - page 17; example 1 *;
 [A]GB2202858  (SERICOL GROUP LTD) [A] 1-9 * page 9 - page 10; example 1 *;
 [A]EP0167779  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 24; claim - *;
 [A]EP0069978  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim - *
by applicantEP0502562
 US2760863
 US3558309
 EP0362827
    "UV-Curing Chemistry: Past, Present and Future, by CHRISTIAN DECKER; Photoreactive Polymers, by ARNOST REISER; Organic photochemical imaging Systems, by G.A. DELZENNE", JOURNAL OF COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (198708), vol. 59, no. 751, pages 97 - 106,