blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0794275

EP0794275 - A fabric for the confection of roller blinds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/37]Enhancements introduced in the manufacturing of roller blinds
[1999/39]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
l'Estor, S.L.
Avda, Barberá 328-332
08203 Sabadell (Barcelona) / ES
[1997/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Fernandez Lopez, Raimond
Avda. Barberá, 328-332
08203 Sabadell (Barcelona) / ES
[1997/37]
Representative(s)Ungria López, Javier, et al
Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78
28043 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [1997/37]Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al
Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78
28043 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date97200550.826.02.1997
[1997/37]
Priority number, dateES1996000048029.02.1996         Original published format: ES 9600480
[1997/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0794275
Date:10.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0794275
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.1997
ClassificationIPC:D03D11/02, E06B9/40
[1997/37]
CPC:
D03D11/02 (EP,US); E06B9/40 (EP,US); Y10S160/07 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/37]
TitleGerman:Gewebe zur Herstellung von Rollvorhängen[1999/39]
English:A fabric for the confection of roller blinds[1999/39]
French:Tissu pour la fabrication de volets roulants[1999/39]
Former [1997/37]Verbesserungen zur Herstellung von Rollvorhängen
Former [1997/37]Enhancements introduced in the manufacturing of roller blinds
Former [1997/37]Améliorations dans la fabrication de volets roulants
Examination procedure10.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
25.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.01.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2000Fee for grant paid
27.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.05.2001  12.03.2002  ADMISSIBLE
HUNTER DOUGLAS Industries B.V.
Piekstraat 2, P.O.Box 5072
NL-3008 AB Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Schapira, Ronald Allen
Hunter Douglas Industries B.V.
2, Piekstraat
3071 EL Rotterdam / NL
 02  23.05.2001  26.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
AB Ludvig Svensson
-
511 82 Kinna / SE
Opponent's representative
Hammond, Andrew David
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Gothenburg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/39]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2001  12.03.2002  ADMISSIBLE
HUNTER DOUGLAS Industries B.V.
Piekstraat 2, P.O.Box 5072
NL-3008 AB Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Schapira, Ronald Allen
Hunter Douglas Industries B.V. 2, Piekstraat
3071 EL Rotterdam / NL
 02  23.05.2001  26.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
AB Ludvig Svensson
-
511 82 Kinna / SE
Opponent's representative
Hammond, Andrew David
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2001/31]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2001   
HUNTER DOUGLAS Industries B.V.
Piekstraat 2, P.O.Box 5072
NL-3008 AB Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Schapira, Ronald Allen
Hunter Douglas Industries B.V. 2, Piekstraat
3071 EL Rotterdam / NL
 02  23.05.2001   
AB Ludvig Svensson
-
511 82 Kinna / SE
Opponent's representative
Hammond, Andrew David
Göteborgs Patentbyra Dahls AB, Sjöporten 4
417 64 Göteborg / SE
Former [2001/30]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2001    ADMISSIBLE
HUNTER DOUGLAS Industries B.V.
Piekstraat 2, P.O.Box 5072
NL-3008 AB Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Schapira, Ronald Allen
Hunter Douglas Industries B.V. 2, Piekstraat
3071 EL Rotterdam / NL
15.03.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.07.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.09.2003Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.11.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
13.12.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/18]
Appeal following opposition27.01.2004Appeal received No.  T0172/04
26.07.2004Statement of grounds filed
13.12.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
13.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH23.08.2000
LI23.08.2000
IE26.02.2001
LU26.02.2001
MC28.02.2001
[2007/29]
Former [2006/39]CH23.08.2000
LI23.08.2000
IE26.02.2001
MC28.02.2001
LU26.02.2002
Former [2004/39]CH23.08.2000
LI23.08.2000
IE26.02.2001
LU26.02.2002
Former [2002/14]CH23.08.2000
LI23.08.2000
IE26.02.2001
Former [2002/02]CH23.08.2000
LI23.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]FR517702  (GRAFTON FRANCAIS LTD ETS) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0106771  (LOUISON & CIE SA [FR]) [A] 3* page 3, line 4 - line 22; figures 3,4,7,8 *;
 [A]GB2237062  (TEW HARRY) [A] 3 * page 4, paragraphs 2-3; figures 1,3 *;
 [XA]DE4320007  (DRIESSEN EDGAR [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,5,6;
 [XA]DE4419410  (HINDERER ULRICH JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,5,6
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.