Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0806702 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0806702



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 182
18.01.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 19
29.09.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
19.07.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
19.07.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.07.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 5
08.07.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.07.2004 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
17.03.2004 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
26.07.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
23.07.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
06.05.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
01.05.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
01.03.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.02.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.01.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.01.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
03.01.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
03.01.2002 Means of redress Search / examination 1
03.01.2002 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.01.2002 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.01.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.01.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.12.2001 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
05.06.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.06.2001 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.05.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.05.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.05.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
25.05.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.05.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
02.05.2000 Description Search / examination 2
02.05.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.04.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
06.03.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.10.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.06.1998 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.04.1998 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.12.1997 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
22.08.1997 Drawings Search / examination 13
22.08.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.07.1997 Deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
27.05.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.05.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
01.04.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.04.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
01.04.1997 Description Search / examination 34
01.04.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.1997 Drawings Search / examination 17
01.04.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7