Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0802680 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0802680



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 161
07.04.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
07.04.1997 Priority document Search / examination 20
07.04.1997 Drawings Search / examination 2
07.04.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.1997 Description Search / examination 13
07.04.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
07.04.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.07.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.11.1999 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 5
06.06.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
16.06.2000 Brief communication with time limit Search / examination 6
25.07.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.08.2002 Request for change of address Search / examination 19
21.08.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
10.10.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.03.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 9
14.03.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 9
27.03.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.03.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
05.07.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.07.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
11.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
30.03.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.03.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.06.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
02.08.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
02.08.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.08.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.11.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
23.11.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.11.2006 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.01.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.12.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
12.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1