blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0802680 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0802680



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 161
12.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
21.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
19.12.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.01.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.11.2006 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.11.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.11.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
02.08.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.08.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.08.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
12.06.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
30.03.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.03.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.07.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
05.07.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.03.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
27.03.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.03.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 9
13.03.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 9
10.10.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.08.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
09.08.2002 Request for change of address Search / examination 19
25.07.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.06.2000 Brief communication with time limit Search / examination 6
06.06.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
16.11.1999 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 5
20.07.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.04.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.04.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
07.04.1997 Description Search / examination 13
07.04.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.1997 Drawings Search / examination 2
07.04.1997 Priority document Search / examination 20
07.04.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7