blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0802680


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.10.2009 Change - applicant published on  18.11.2009  [2009/47]
22.08.2008 Change - applicant published on  24.09.2008  [2008/39]
11.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2008  [2008/07]
21.12.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  23.01.2008  [2008/04]
12.01.2007 (Expected) grant published on  14.02.2007  [2007/07]
04.01.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.01.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.07.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.06.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.05.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.08.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.07.2005 First examination report
30.06.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.05.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.05.2003 Renewal fee
28.03.2003 Change - applicant published on  14.05.2003  [2003/20]
16.08.2002 Change - applicant published on  02.10.2002  [2002/40]
21.05.2002 Renewal fee
15.05.2001 Renewal fee
02.02.2001 Request for examination filed published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
11.08.2000 Change - inventor published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
02.06.2000 Publication of search report published on  19.07.2000 [2000/29]
10.05.2000 Renewal fee
26.11.1999 Change - name/address published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
14.05.1999 Renewal fee
05.09.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.10.1997 [1997/43]