blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0802680
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59712814D 29.03.2007D1
Priority number Date
DE59712814 07.04.1997
DE19615493 19.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP4123539BGlobal Dossier 23.07.2008B2
JPH1069544 10.03.1998A
Priority number Date
DE19615493 19.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0802680Global Dossier 14.02.2007B1
EP0802680 19.07.2000A3
EP0802680 22.10.1997A2
Priority number Date
DE19615493 19.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1106765C 23.04.2003C
CN1168056 17.12.1997A
Priority number Date
DE19615493 19.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19615493 23.10.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19615493 19.04.1996