blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0802680

Designated contracting states DE 
 FILapse: 14.02.2007
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure12.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
European patent granted14.02.2007
Opposition procedure15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit published on 23.01.2008 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:22.10.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:APPLICANT DATA CHANGED
Owner Name:PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:APPLICANT DATA CHANGED
Owner Name:KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
 
Event date:19.07.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:IBENTHAL, ACHIM
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:SIGGELKOW, SVEN
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:GRIGAT, ROLF-RAINER, PROF.-DR.-ING.
 
Event date:21.03.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010119
 
Event date:02.10.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH
 
Event date:02.10.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
 
Event date:14.05.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH
 
Event date:14.05.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
 
Event date:17.08.2005 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20050705
 
Event date:14.02.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070214
 
Event date:14.02.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB
 
Event date:14.02.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:29.03.2007 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59712814
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20070329
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:06.06.2007 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20070516
 
Event date:24.08.2007 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:23.01.2008 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20071115
 
Event date:20.08.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:13.03.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:30.07.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20100506
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:20.01.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20111230
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110502
 
Event date:08.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R084 59712814 DE
Code Expl.: DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE
Effective DATE:20110426
 
Event date:18.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., KY
Effective DATE:20120418
 
Event date:23.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59712814 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE
 
Event date:13.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59712814 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE
Effective DATE:20121023
 
Event date:13.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59712814 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:ENTROPIC COMMUNICATIONS, INC., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., GRAND CAYMAN, KY
Effective DATE:20121023
 
Event date:13.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59712814 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:ENTROPIC COMMUNICATIONS, INC., SAN DIEGO, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., GRAND CAYMAN, KY
Effective DATE:20121023
 
Event date:13.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59712814 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:EPPING HERMANN FISCHER PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHA, DE
Effective DATE:20121023
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20130429
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20130429
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:01.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 59712814 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140407
 
Event date:22.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 59712814 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20141101
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140407
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141101