Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0802680

EP0802680 - Image segmentation method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - applicantpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FI  FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2009/47]
Former [2008/39]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FI  FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2007/07]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FI  FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2003/20]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FI  FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/40]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FI  FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/02]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
For:FI  FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1997/43]For:DE 
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH
Röntgenstrasse 24
22335 Hamburg / DE
For:FI  FR  GB 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Ibenthal, Achim
c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH.
Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE
02 / Siggelkow, Sven
c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH.
Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE
03 / Grigat, Rolf-Rainer, Prof.-Dr.-Ing.
c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH.
Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE
[2000/39]
Former [1997/43]01 / Ibenthal, Achim
c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH.
Röntgenstra e 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE
02 / Siggelkow, Sven
c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH.
Röntgenstra e 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE
03 / Grigat, Rolf-Rainer, Prof.-Dr.-Ing.
c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH.
Röntgenstra e 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE
Representative(s)von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24
22335 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date97201016.907.04.1997
[1997/43]
Priority number, dateDE199611549319.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19615493
[1997/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0802680
Date:22.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0802680
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0802680
Date:14.02.2007
Language:DE
[2007/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/26, H04N7/36
[1997/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB [1997/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bildsegmentierung[1997/43]
English:Image segmentation method[1997/43]
French:Procédé de segmentation d'images[1997/43]
Examination procedure19.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
05.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2006Fee for grant paid
12.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI14.02.2007
[2008/07]
Documents cited:Search[E]US5623310  (KIM JIN-HUN [KR]) [E] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 30 * * figure 1 *;
 [PX]JPH08340553  (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [PX] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [PX]  SIGGELKOW S. ; GRIGAT R-R; IBENTHAL A., "Segmentation of image sequences for object oriented coding", IMAGE PROCESSING, 1996. PROCEEDINGS, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (19960916), vol. 1, no. 1996, pages 477 - 480 vol.2, XP002138262 [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1996.560892
 [DA]  SALEMBIER P ET AL, "REGION-BASED VIDEO CODING USING MATHEMATICAL MORPHOLOGY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE,US,IEEE. NEW YORK, (19950601), vol. 83, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 843 - 857, XP000518739 [DA] 1,6,7,9 * page 843 - page 849 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.387088