Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0802006

EP0802006 - Cutting tool with clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.11.2001
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.01.2002  [2002/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plansee Tizit Aktiengesellschaft
6600 Reutte /Tirol / AT
[1999/47]
Former [1997/43]For all designated states
PLANSEE TIZIT GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.
6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Duwe, Jürgen
Unterdorf 24/1
6611 Heiterwang / AT
02 / Stricker, Rudolf
Lussgasse 10
6631 Lermoos / AT
[1997/43]
Representative(s)Lohnert, Wolfgang
Lähn 12
6600 Breitenwang / Reutte / AT
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]Lohnert, Wolfgang, Dr.
Plansee Aktiengesellschaft
6600 Reutte / AT
Application number, filing date97201086.211.04.1997
[1997/43]
Priority number, dateAT1996000021618.04.1996         Original published format: AT 21696
[1997/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0802006
Date:22.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0802006
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:B23B27/04
[1997/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/43]
TitleGerman:Schneidwerkzeug mit Klemmvorrichtung[1997/43]
English:Cutting tool with clamping device[1997/43]
French:Outil de coupe avec dispositif de serrage[1997/43]
Examination procedure21.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/43]
02.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)     
deleted
 [2001/33]
Former [2001/25]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.2001   
Sandvik AB
Patent Department
S-81181 Sandviken / SE
Opponent's representative
Taquist, Lennart
Sandvik AB Patent Department
811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE
12.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1270924  (HERTEL KARL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 52; figure - *;
 [A]EP0291933  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 3 * figures 18,19 *;
 [A]WO9529026  (SANDVIK AB [SE], et al);
 [A]US5211516  (KRESS DIETER [DE], et al)