blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0808024

EP0808024 - Electrical load driving device including load current limiting circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  16.11.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2007Change - refusalpublished on 19.12.2007  [2007/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2000/45]
Former [1997/47]For all designated states
DELCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
700 East Firmin Street
Kokomo Indiana 46902 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Disney, Donald Ray
708 Riverview Drive
Kokomo, Indiana 46901 / US
02 / Shreve, John Robert
310 Branded Boulevard
Kokomo, Indiana 46901 / US
[1997/47]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John, et al
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]Denton, Michael John, et al
Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date97201173.821.04.1997
[1997/47]
Priority number, dateUS1996065014817.05.1996         Original published format: US 650148
[1997/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0808024
Date:19.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0808024
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:H03K17/0812, H03K17/082
[1997/47]
CPC:
H03K17/0828 (EP,US); F02P3/051 (EP,US); H03K17/08128 (EP,US);
H03K17/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/47]
TitleGerman:Elektrische Lasttreibervorrichtung mit einer Schaltung zum Begrenzen des Laststromes[1997/47]
English:Electrical load driving device including load current limiting circuitry[1997/47]
French:Dispositif électrique d'attaque de charge comprenant un circuit de limitation de courant de charge[1997/47]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
22.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/50]
23.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/51]
02.02.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/50]
06.02.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/51]
Appeal following examination06.03.2004Appeal received No.  T0835/04
13.12.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0487964  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 3; figures 1,2 * [A] 7;
 [XA]DE4300953  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,10 * page 2, line 65 - page 4, line 27; figures 1,3 * [A] 8;
 [A]EP0632501  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 4,5,8,11* column 3, line 36 - column 7, line 20; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]EP0702455  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,6 * column 5, line 32 - line 57; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.