EP0805135 - Process for the preparation of 2-H-heptafluoropropane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2000/48] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vollmueller, Helmut Am Jungstueck 18 55130 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Franz, Raimund Insterburger Strasse 16 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 03 /
Siegemund, Günther Frankfurter Strasse 21 65719 Hofheim / DE | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 97201260.3 | 25.04.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | DE1996117091 | 29.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19617091 | [1997/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0805135 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805135 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/087, C07C19/08 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
C07C17/087 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/087, C07C19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1997/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-H-Heptafluorpropan | [1997/45] | English: | Process for the preparation of 2-H-heptafluoropropane | [1997/45] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation du 2-h-heptafluoropropane | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0634384 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0634383 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1; claim - *; | [PA]WO9711042 (SOLVAY [BE], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document * |