Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0807992

EP0807992 - Logarithmic spiral array [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]For all designated states
THE BOEING COMPANY
P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08
Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dougherty, Robert P.
10914 NE 18th Street
Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US
[1997/47]
Representative(s)Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Former [1997/47]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date97201481.516.05.1997
[1997/47]
Priority number, dateUS1996064939817.05.1996         Original published format: US 649398
[1997/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0807992
Date:19.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0807992
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01Q21/20, H01Q3/26
[1997/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/47]
TitleGerman:Logarithmische spiralförmige Wandleranordnung[1997/47]
English:Logarithmic spiral array[1997/47]
French:Réseau en forme de spirale logarithmique[1997/47]
Examination procedure29.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
07.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2002Fee for grant paid
15.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4324140  (AULD BERTRAM A) [X] 1,2 * column 5 *;
 [X]  HALL P S ET AL, "SEQUENTIALLY ROTATED ARRAYS WITH REDUCED SIDELOBE LEVELS", IEE PROCEEDINGS: MICROWAVES, ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, (19940801), vol. 141, no. 4, PART H, pages 321 - 325, XP000484798 [X] 1,2 * page 323 - page 325 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-map:19941193