Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0811882

EP0811882 - Laser pattern generation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Former [1997/50]For all designated states
ETEC SYSTEMS, INC.
9100 S.W. Gemini Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Allen, Paul C.
10500 S.W. 161st Ct.
Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US
02 / Teitzel, Robin L.
9385 N.W. Murlea Lane
Portland, Oregon 97229 / US
03 / Jolley, Matthew J.
15170 N.W. Perimeter Dr.
Beaverton, Oregon, 97006 / US
04 / Rieger, Michael
4215 S.W. Stephenson Street
Portland, Oregon 97219 / US
[1997/50]
Representative(s)Wombwell, Francis
Forresters
15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/50]Wombwell, Francis
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date97202325.322.10.1993
[1997/50]
Priority number, dateUS1992097048002.11.1992         Original published format: US 970480
[1997/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0811882
Date:10.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0811882
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/20, G02B26/12, H04N1/047, B23K26/04, B23K26/06
[1997/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/50]
TitleGerman:Mustererzeugungsapparat unter Verwendung eines Lasers[1997/50]
English:Laser pattern generation apparatus[1997/50]
French:Appareil de formation de motifs utilisant une source laser[1997/50]
Examination procedure19.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/29]
31.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2002Fee for grant paid
10.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93924402.6  / EP0670784
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.09.1997DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.10.1997
24.09.1997FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.10.1997
24.09.1997GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.10.1997
24.09.1997IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.10.1997
24.09.1997NL   M01   Fee paid on   03.10.1997
24.09.1997SE   M01   Fee paid on   03.10.1997
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.12.199705   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.1998
31.10.199806   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
[2004/51]
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[DY]US4796038  (ALLEN PAUL C [US], et al) [DY] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 42 * * column 7, line 35 - line 39 * * figures 1,7 *;
 [YX]US4998260  (TANIURA HIROSHI [JP]) [Y] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 5 - line 60 * * column 3, line 25 - column 6, line 18 * * figure . * [X] 3,4;
 [XY]US4618759  (MUELLER GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 3,4 * column 1, line 34 - line 47 * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 53 * * figures 1,2,4,5 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]US5085509  (GAFFARD JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al) [Y] 5,6 * column 5, line 35 - column 8, line 35 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0293823  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,3,6 * column 1, line 4 - line 8 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 13 * * figures 1,2 *