Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0816413 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0816413



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 249
12.04.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.04.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.07.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.04.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
01.04.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
01.04.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
02.02.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.02.2004 Annex Search / examination 3
02.02.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
02.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
02.02.2004 Description Search / examination 3
02.02.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
02.12.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.12.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.11.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 23
16.09.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.09.2003 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 5
14.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
02.07.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.06.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 7
23.06.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.11.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
20.07.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
21.06.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
11.06.2001 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
05.03.2001 Claims Appeal 3
05.03.2001 Statement of grounds Appeal 5
28.02.2001 Statement of grounds Appeal 8
20.12.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.10.2000 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
24.10.2000 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
24.10.2000 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 10
24.10.2000 Means of redress Search / examination 1
16.03.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
16.03.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.03.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
11.01.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.12.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.09.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.09.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.09.1998 European search report Search / examination 2
22.12.1997 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.1997 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
26.11.1997 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.11.1997 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.11.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
11.09.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.09.1997 Claims Search / examination 4
11.09.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
11.09.1997 Description Search / examination 14
11.09.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.1997 Invitation to confirm documents filed by telegram/facsimile Search / examination 1
11.09.1997 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
11.09.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.09.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
20.08.1997 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.08.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.08.1997 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 19
07.08.1991 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.08.1991 Priority document Search / examination 16
07.08.1991 Priority document Search / examination 16