Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0831386

EP0831386 - Disconnected write authorization in a client/server computing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road, M/S Palo 1-521
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road, MS PAL1-521
Palo Alto, California 94043 / US
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road, MS PAL01-521
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Former [1998/13]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
2550 Garcia Avenue, MS PAL1-521
Mountain View, California 94043-1100 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mastors, Robert N.
8340 Capewood Court
Colorado Springs, CO 80920 / US
02 / Stillwell, Michael J.
4285 Star Ranch Road
Colorado Springs, CO 80920 / US
[1998/13]
Representative(s)Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date97202804.712.09.1997
[1998/13]
Priority number, dateUS1996071518317.09.1996         Original published format: US 715183
[1998/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0831386
Date:25.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0831386
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[1998/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1998/50]
Former [1998/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Berechtigung zum abgetrennten Schreiben in einer Benutzer/Anbieter-Rechneranordnung[1998/13]
English:Disconnected write authorization in a client/server computing system[1998/13]
French:Autorisation d'écriture déconnectée dans un système d'ordinateur client/serveur[1998/13]
Examination procedure27.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/39]
27.07.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
14.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
16.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2000Fee for grant paid
20.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL31.05.2000
SE31.08.2000
[2003/09]
Former [2001/27]SE31.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9524685  (IBM [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 3 *;
 [Y]EP0456920  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 5, line 40 - page 7, line 30 *;
 [A]EP0714066  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 3 *;
 [A]EP0398494  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *