Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0859109

EP0859109 - Cupboard and the hinges used thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Openbaar Lichaam Sociale Werkvoorziening Drechtsteden h.o.d.n. Drechtwerk
Kamerlingh Onnesweg 1
3316 GK Dordrecht / NL
[1998/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Bas, Willem Leonard
Hoofdstraat 26
4765 CE Zevenbergschen Hoek / NL
02 / Van Galen, Johannes Ignatius Frederikus
Maaskanterf 31
3315 KK Dordrecht / NL
03 / Boschman, Robert Theodorus Franciscus
Obrechtstraat 21
3314 NS Dordrecht / NL
04 / Van Duin, Adrianus Lambertus
De Schans 20C
4223 NS Hoornaar / NL
[1998/34]
Representative(s)Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [1998/34]Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date97203618.020.11.1997
[1998/34]
Priority number, dateNL1996100458821.11.1996         Original published format: NL 1004588
[1998/34]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0859109
Date:19.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0859109
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0859109
Date:17.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:E05D5/02, E05D11/06, A47B61/00
[1998/34]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   NL [2000/40]
Former [1998/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schrankmöbel und dabei anzuwendendes Scharnierelement[1998/34]
English:Cupboard and the hinges used thereon[1998/34]
French:Placard et les charnières utilisées là-dessus[1998/34]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
18.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2003Fee for grant paid
17.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4318576  (FORD ALAN A) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 47 - line 55 *;
 [A]FR2204960  (SCHAEFER WERKE KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, line 25; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2162813  (SCHWARTE FRANZ FITSCHENF) [A] 3,7 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2342043  (SONESSON INREDNINGAR AB [SE])