Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0842600

EP0842600 - A construction for automatically milking animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2005New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid 
15.04.2005Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 01.06.2005  [2005/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
[1998/21]
Inventor(s)01 / van der Lely, Cornelis
7 Brüschenrain
6300 Zug / CH
[1998/21]
Representative(s)Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Former [1998/21]Mulder, Herman , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Application number, filing date97203714.702.04.1993
[1998/21]
Priority number, dateNL1992000063906.04.1992         Original published format: NL 9200639
[1998/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0842600
Date:20.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0842600
Date:17.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/29]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0842600
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:A01J5/017
[1998/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1998/21]
TitleGerman:Gerät zum automatischen Melken von Tieren[1998/21]
English:A construction for automatically milking animals[1998/21]
French:Dispositif de traite automatique d'animaux[1998/21]
Examination procedure02.11.1998Examination requested  [1998/53]
13.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2001Fee for grant paid
14.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93200982.2  / EP0565189
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.04.2003   
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Michael Charles
Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/23]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2003   
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Michael Charles
Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
22.05.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.10.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.10.2004Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.10.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.02.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.04.2005Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
01.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
01.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0332232  (LELY NV C VAN DER) [A] 1 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 7 * * column 6, line 9 - line 16 * * figure 4; claims 1,6-8 *;
 [A]EP0349019  (LELY NV C VAN DER) [A] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 11 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 2 * * figures 1,3; claims 1,11 *;
 [XY]GB2218888  (HANAUER) [X] 14-16,27,28,33,34 * page 15, line 9 - line 22 * * page 28, line 16 - page 32, line 24 * * figures 1,15-19 * [Y] 17-20,35;
 [YA]EP0300582  (LELY NV C VAN DER) [Y] 17-20 * column 14, line 45 - line 57; figure 4 * [A] 25;
 [Y]EP0232568  (MULTINORM BV) [Y] 35 * column 7, line 23 - line 50; figures 10,A-C *;
 [X]EP0467489  (LELY NV C VAN DER) [X] 14 * Abstract *;
 [X]EP0302559  (GASCOIGNE MELOTTE BV) [X] 14 * column 2, line 29 - line 54 *;
 [A]WO8502973  (GASCOIGNE MELOTTE BV) [A] 36 * page 6, line 2 - line 5; figures 4,5 *
ExaminationUS4010714
 US5069160
 EP0313109
    - VDI/MEG Kolloquium Landtechnik, Heft 9, "Robotereinsatz in der Landwirtschaft am Beispiel des Melkens", Tagung 5/6 Dezember 1990