EP0845908 - Compressing a signal combined from compression encoded video signals after partial decoding thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/23] | Video compression | ||
[2002/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snell & Wilcox Limited Durford Mill Petersfield Hampshire GU31 5AZ / GB | For all designated states BRITISH BROADCASTING CORPORATION Broadcasting House London W1A 1AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states Snell & Wilcox Limited Durford Mill Petersfield, Hampshire GU31 5AZ / GB | ||
For all designated states BRITISH BROADCASTING CORPORATION Broadcasting House London W1A 1AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knee, Michael James 6 Woodbury Avenue Petersfield, Hampshire, GU32 2EE / GB | 02 /
Wells, Nicholas Dominic 211 Queens Park Road Brighton, Sussex, BN2 2ZA / GB | 03 /
Devlin, Bruce Fairbairn 4 Ashvale Cottages Chiddingfold, Sussex, GU8 4RD / GB | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97204116.4 | 19.06.1995 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | GB19940012148 | 17.06.1994 Original published format: GB 9412148 | GB19950001741 | 30.01.1995 Original published format: GB 9501741 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0845908 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0845908 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845908 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
H04N19/40 (EP,US);
H04N19/142 (EP,US);
H04N19/179 (EP,US);
H04N19/42 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/23] | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [1998/23] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Komprimieren eines aus kompressionskodierten Videosignalen nach deren Teildekodierung kombinierten Signales | [2002/16] | English: | Compressing a signal combined from compression encoded video signals after partial decoding thereof | [2002/16] | French: | Compression d'un signal combiné à partir de plusieurs signaux vidéo comprimés et partiellement décodés | [2002/16] |
Former [1998/23] | Videokompression | ||
Former [1998/23] | Video compression | ||
Former [1998/23] | Compression vidéo | Examination procedure | 27.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 13.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95922607.7 / EP0765576 | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.02.2003 | FR | 05.02.2003 | IT | 05.02.2003 | NL | 05.02.2003 | DE | 06.05.2003 | IE | 19.06.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 05.02.2003 | |
FR | 05.02.2003 | ||
NL | 05.02.2003 | ||
DE | 06.05.2003 | ||
IE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | BE | 05.02.2003 | |
NL | 05.02.2003 | ||
DE | 06.05.2003 | ||
IE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | BE | 05.02.2003 | |
NL | 05.02.2003 | ||
DE | 06.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | NL | 05.02.2003 | |
DE | 06.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 05.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0492528 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [XAY]EP0584741 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 5 [Y] 3,4; | [PX]EP0618734 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 5 * abstract * * page 12, line 12 - line 50 *; | [PX]EP0627858 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1 * abstract *; | [Y] - C. HERPEL, "Der MPEG-2 standard : Hierarchische Video-Codierung: Ansätze zur Service-Interoperabilität (Teil 3)", FERNSEH- UND KINO-TECHNIK, vol. 48, no. 6, pages 311 - 316,318-319, XP000457152 [Y] 3,4 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0498674 |