Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0789341

EP0789341 - Vehicle on board detection of traffic jam [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft
Mannesmannufer 2
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
[1997/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Vieweg, Stefan
Joachimstrasse 48
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[1997/33]
Representative(s)Meissner, Peter E. , et al
Meissner & Meissner
Patentanwaltsbüro
Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/33]Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date97250017.729.01.1997
[1997/33]
Priority number, dateDE199610625806.02.1996         Original published format: DE 19606258
[1997/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0789341
Date:13.08.1997
Language:DE
[1997/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0789341
Date:09.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/01
[1997/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/33]
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugautonome Detektion von Verkehrsstau[1997/33]
English:Vehicle on board detection of traffic jam[1997/33]
French:Détection de bouchon de circulation embarquée dans le véhicule[1997/33]
Examination procedure26.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/33]
16.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2000Fee for grant paid
27.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI09.05.2001
DK09.08.2001
PT09.08.2001
SE09.08.2001
GR10.08.2001
ES30.11.2001
BE31.01.2002
[2004/51]
Former [2004/04]FI09.05.2001
DK09.08.2001
PT09.08.2001
SE09.08.2001
ES30.11.2001
BE31.01.2002
Former [2003/48]FI09.05.2001
DK09.08.2001
PT09.08.2001
SE09.08.2001
BE31.01.2002
Former [2003/46]FI09.05.2001
DK09.08.2001
PT09.08.2001
SE09.08.2001
Former [2002/27]FI09.05.2001
PT09.08.2001
SE09.08.2001
Former [2002/15]FI09.05.2001
SE09.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE09.08.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9514292  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9525321  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 16 - page 8, line 19; figure 1 *;
 [A]  IOKIBE T ET AL, "TRAFFIC PREDICTION METHOD BY FUZZY LOGIC", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUZZY SYSTEMS, SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 28 - APR. 1, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930328), vol. 2, pages 673 - 678, XP000371490 [A] 1-7 * figures 2-6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FUZZY.1993.327408
 [A]  LINNARTZ J -P M G ET AL, "MONITORING A METROPOLITAN FREEWAY SYSTEM USING PROBE VEHICLES AND RANDOM ACCESS RADIO CHANNEL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, STOCKHOLM, JUNE 8 - 10, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940608), vol. 1, pages 410 - 414, XP000496706
by applicantDE4321437