EP0797927 - Soybean protein hydrolysate, process for producing the same, and meat products and drinks using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI OIL CO., LTD. 1-5, 2-Chome, Nishi-Shinsaibashi, Chuo-ku Osaka 542 / JP | [1997/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsumura, Kazunobu, c/o Fuji Oil Co., Ltd. Tsukuba R & D Center, 4-3, Kinunodai Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun / JP | 02 /
Kugimiya, Wataru, c/o Fuji Oil Co., Ltd. Tsukuba R & D Center, 4-3, Kinunodai Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki 300-24 / JP | 03 /
Hoshino, Kumikou, c/o Fuji Oil Co., Ltd. Tsukuba R & D Center, 4-3, Kinunodai Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki 300-24 / JP | 04 /
Kudo, Tohru, c/o Fuji Oil Co., Ltd. Tsukuba R & D Center, 4-3, Kinunodai Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki 300-24 / JP | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Ziebig, Marlene, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 DE-10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Ziebig, Marlene, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig Lützowplatz 11-13 10785 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 97250102.7 | 27.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | JP19960074434 | 28.03.1996 Original published format: JP 7443496 | JP19960322896 | 03.12.1996 Original published format: JP 32289696 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797927 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797927 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/34, A23L1/318, A23L1/317, A23L1/39, A23L2/66, A23G1/00 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
A23L2/66 (EP,US);
A23G1/56 (EP,US);
A23J3/346 (EP,US);
A23L13/65 (EP,US);
A23L13/74 (EP,US);
A23L23/00 (EP,US);
A23G2200/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23G1/56, A23G2200/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB [1997/40] | Title | German: | Sojaproteinhydrolysat, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Fleischprodukte und Getränke unter Verwendung derselben | [1997/40] | English: | Soybean protein hydrolysate, process for producing the same, and meat products and drinks using the same | [1997/40] | French: | Hydrolysat de protéines de soja, procédé pour l'obtenir et produits carnés et boissons l'utilisant | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 30.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60176549 ; | [A]JPH06197788 ; | [DA]JPS62232341 ; | [DA]JPH0646799 ; | [A]FR2184519 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-3 * claims 6-11 * * page 7, paragraph 2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 42, Database accession no. 85-261149, XP002033150 & JPS60176549 A 19850910 (NISSHIN OIL MILLS LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 33, Database accession no. 94-268692, XP002033151 & JPH06197788 A 19940719 (FUJI SEIYU KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880405), vol. 012, no. 103, Database accession no. (C - 485), & JP62232341 A 19871012 (FUJI OIL CO LTD) [DA] 1-3 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 12, Database accession no. 94-096990, XP002033152 & JPH0646799 A 19940222 (AJINOMOTO KK) [DA] 4 * abstract * | [A] - SNYDER, H.E., Soybean Utilization, NEW YORK, VAN NOSTRAND REINHOLD COMPANY, (1987), XP002033149 [A] 4 * pages 275-276 * |