Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0800066

EP0800066 - Precise calibration of wavelengths in a spectrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PERKIN-ELMER CORPORATION
761 Main Avenue Norwalk
Connecticut 06859-0181 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/41]For all designated states
THE PERKIN-ELMER CORPORATION
761 Main Avenue
Norwalk Connecticut 06859-0181 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ganz, Alan M.
145 Sterling Road
Trumbull, CT 06611 / US
02 / Tracy, David H.
581 Belden Hill Road
Norwalk, CT 06850 / US
03 / Hoult, Robert A.
Post Office Lane
Beaconsfield, Buckinghamshire HP9 1QA / GB
[1997/41]
Representative(s)Weisse, Jürgen , et al
Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtreustrasse 38
10623 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/41]Weisse, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Jürgen Weisse Dipl.-Chem. Dr. Rudolf Wolgast Fuggerstrasse 26
10777 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date97250178.707.01.1993
[1997/41]
Priority number, dateUS1992083444812.02.1992         Original published format: US 834448
[1997/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0800066
Date:08.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0800066
Date:25.02.1998
[1998/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0800066
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/28
[1997/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/41]
TitleGerman:Genaue Wellenlängeneichung eines Spektrometers[1997/41]
English:Precise calibration of wavelengths in a spectrometer[1997/41]
French:Etalonnage précis en longueur d'onde d'un spectromètre[1997/41]
Examination procedure24.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/44]
21.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2002Fee for grant paid
18.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93100106.9  / EP0560006
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
01.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200311   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2004/02]NL18.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0463600  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,7 * abstract * * figures 6,7; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US4692883  (NELSON MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1,3,7 * column 9, line 18 - column 10, line 13 *