blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0836847

EP0836847 - Stable O1/W/O2 multiple emulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LANCASTER GROUP GmbH
Rheinstrasse 4E, Fort Malakoff
55116 Mainz / DE
[2000/39]
Former [1998/17]For all designated states
LANCASTER GROUP GmbH
Ludwig-Bertram-Strasse 8-10
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ferrero, Louis
Corniche Adré de Joly
06000 Nice / FR
02 / Golz, Karin
34 Quai des Sanbarbani
98000 Monaco / MC
03 / Zastrow, Leonhard
34 Quai des Sanbarbani
98000 Monaco / MC
04 / Stanzl, Klaus
47 Wyndham Close
White Plains, N.Y. 10605 / US
[1998/17]
Representative(s)Walter, Wolf-Jürgen, et al
Anwaltskanzlei
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider
Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]Walter, Wolf-Jürgen, et al
Patentanwälte Felke & Walter Normannenstrasse 1-2
10367 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date97250265.211.09.1997
[1998/17]
Priority number, dateDE199613872913.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19638729
[1998/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0836847
Date:22.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0836847
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0836847
Date:20.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/00
[1998/17]
CPC:
A61Q17/04 (EP,US); A61K8/066 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   MC [2000/39]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  LI 
Former [1998/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stabile Mehrphasenemulsion vom Typ O1/W/O2[1998/17]
English:Stable O1/W/O2 multiple emulsion[1998/17]
French:Emulsion multiple stable de type O1/W/O2[1998/17]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, NL, PT, SE
01.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI
07.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2003Fee for grant paid
10.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
03.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0281394  (RICHARDSON VICKS INC [US]);
 [A]EP0559013  (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]);
 [A]US5304334  (LAHANAS KONSTANTINOS M [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.