Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0836848

EP0836848 - Cosmetic tanning and sunscreen composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.11.2004  [2004/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LANCASTER GROUP GmbH
Rheinstrasse 4E, Fort Malakoff
55116 Mainz / DE
[2003/29]
Former [1998/17]For all designated states
LANCASTER GROUP GmbH
Ludwig-Bertram-Strasse 8-10
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Cernasov, Domnica
34 Edward Drive
Ringwood, NJ 07556 / US
02 / Macchio, Ralph
194 Mooney Road
Flanders, NJ 07836 / US
03 / Stanzl, Klaus, Dr.
47 Wyndham Close
White Plains, N.Y. 10605 / US
04 / Zastrow, Leonhard, Prof. Dr.
34 Quai des Sanbarbani
98000 Monaco / MC
[1998/17]
Representative(s)Walter, Wolf-Jürgen , et al
Anwaltskanzlei
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider
Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]Walter, Wolf-Jürgen , et al
Patentanwälte Felke & Walter Normannenstrasse 1-2
10367 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date97250303.116.10.1997
[1998/17]
Priority number, dateDE199614463717.10.1996         Original published format: DE 19644637
[1998/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0836848
Date:22.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0836848
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0836848
Date:26.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/42
[1998/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   MC,   NL [2000/50]
Former [1998/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kosmetisches Hautbräunungs- und Lichtschutzmittel[1998/17]
English:Cosmetic tanning and sunscreen composition[1998/17]
French:Composition cosmétique pour le bronzage de la peau et pour la photoprotection[1998/17]
Examination procedure29.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.05.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, PT, SE
02.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
02.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2003Fee for grant paid
23.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Request for further processing for:23.09.2003Request for further processing filed
23.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH06192610  ;
 [Y]WO9628136  (FABRE PIERRE DERMO COSMETIQUE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 5, line 1 - line 3 * * page 7, line 25 - line 29 * * page 15, line 22 - line 33 * * claim - *;
 [A]WO9534278  (NUSKIN INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 4, line 17 - line 19 * * example - * * claims 1,12 *;
 [A]WO9415580  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-8 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0281394  (RICHARDSON VICKS INC [US]) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]JPH07133210
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941019), vol. 018, no. 547, Database accession no. (C - 1262), [Y] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, [A] 1 * abstract *