Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0785144

EP0785144 - Pallet system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Former [1997/30]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Saggers, Barry
3 Harbourne Close, Walton Court Farm Estate
Aylesbury, Bucks HP21 9LU / GB
[1997/30]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1997/30]Phillips, Margaret Dawn , et al
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Application number, filing date97300298.317.01.1997
[1997/30]
Priority number, dateGB1996000110719.01.1996         Original published format: GB 9601107
[1997/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0785144
Date:23.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0785144
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65D19/44
[1997/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/30]
TitleGerman:Palettensystem[1997/30]
English:Pallet system[1997/30]
French:Système de palette[1997/30]
Examination procedure23.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/13]
19.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.1999Fee for grant paid
30.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR19.01.2000
DE20.04.2000
[2006/32]
Former [2002/11]DE20.04.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2001/09]FR16.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]US4015710  (BIGGS LESTER G) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - line 20; figure 4 *;
 [A]US4735310  (LEMERY RAYMOND E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 25 - line 41; figures 2,3 *
by applicantGB773948
 US5297485
 GB1415784
 EP0309444