blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0785082


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
20.01.2000 Renewal fee
12.01.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
13.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
08.01.1999 Examination report or reply
08.01.1999 Renewal fee
16.12.1998 Examination report or reply
14.12.1998 Examination report or reply
07.08.1998 First examination report
06.08.1998 Examination report or reply
05.08.1998 Examination report or reply
06.06.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.1997 [1997/30]
06.06.1997 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.1997 [1997/30]