Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0785082

EP0785082 - Method of controlling ribbon motor for colour printing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetong-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon-shi
Kyungki-do
Seoul / KR
[N/P]
Former [1997/30]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS Co. Ltd.
416 Maetong-dong, Paldal-gu, Suwon-shi
Kyungki-do, Seoul / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Song, Jun-Pil
112-5, Wuljeon-dong, Jangahn-gu
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
[1997/30]
Representative(s)Chugg, David John , et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax
West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/30]Chugg, David John , et al
Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road
Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date97300342.920.01.1997
[1997/30]
Priority number, dateKR1996000127022.01.1996         Original published format: KR 9601270
[1997/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0785082
Date:23.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0785082
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:B41J17/12
[1997/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/30]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Farbbandantriebsmotors für ein Farbdrucksystem[1997/30]
English:Method of controlling ribbon motor for colour printing system[1997/30]
French:Méthode de commande d'un moteur d'entraînement d'un ruban encreur pour un système d'impression en couleurs[1997/30]
Examination procedure29.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/30]
10.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.1999Fee for grant paid
27.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0440236  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2-5 * column 2, line 16 - line 41; claim 1 *;
 [X]GB2289444  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 19 - line 31 *;
 [A]EP0362818  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2-5 * column 3, line 27 - line 53 *;
 [A]JPS61209183  ;
 [A]JPS60187580
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870210), vol. 011, no. 044, Database accession no. (M - 560), [A] 1-5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860208), vol. 010, no. 033, Database accession no. (M - 452), [A] 1-5 * abstract *