Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0855495

EP0855495 - Hollow valve in an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI OOZX INC.
22-1, Engyo 1-chome Fujisawa-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/31]For all designated states
FUJI OOZX INC.
22-1, Engyo 1-chome
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohtsubo, Kizuku
c/o Fuji Oozx Inc., 22-1, Engyo 1-chome
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Kenmoku, Takeji
c/o Fuji Oozx Inc., 22-1, Engyo 1-chome
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1998/31]
Representative(s)Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/31]Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Application number, filing date97300505.127.01.1997
[1998/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0855495
Date:29.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0855495
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:F01L3/14
[1998/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/31]
TitleGerman:Hohlventil in einer Brennkraftmaschine[1998/31]
English:Hollow valve in an internal combustion engine[1998/31]
French:Soupape creuse dans un moteur à combustion interne[2000/05]
Former [1998/31]Soupape creux dans un moteur à combustion interne
Examination procedure08.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/41]
01.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2000Fee for grant paid
11.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.04.2001
IT11.04.2001
ES30.10.2001
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR11.04.2001
ES30.10.2001
Former [2004/04]FR07.09.2001
ES30.10.2001
Former [2002/17]FR07.09.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0447106  ;
 [X]JPH04124416  ;
 [X]JPH0571316  ;
 [XA]GB224288  (SAM DALZIEL HERON) [X] 1 * page 2, line 73 - line 80 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4;
 [XA]DE695567  (EATON MFG CO) [X] 1 * page 3, line 8 - line 60 * [A] 3,4
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920528), vol. 016, no. 232, Database accession no. (M - 1256), [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920814), vol. 016, no. 380, Database accession no. (M - 1295), [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930722), vol. 017, no. 392, Database accession no. (M - 1450), [X] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPS60145410
 JPS63151911U