blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0786523


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.01.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  28.02.2001 [2001/09]
04.08.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn
12.01.2000 Renewal fee
26.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
19.11.1999 Change - classification published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
19.11.1999 Change - classification published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
21.12.1998 Renewal fee
13.06.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.07.1997 [1997/31]
13.06.1997 Request for examination filed published on  30.07.1997 [1997/31]
18.03.1997 Change - extension states