Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0786523

EP0786523 - Protein kinase and method of using [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.01.2001
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.02.2001 [2001/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/31]For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Beckmann, Richard Paul
5802 Petersburg Parkway
Indianapolis, Indiana 46254 / US
02 / Burke, Teresa Faye
13160 Nottingham Road
Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US
03 / Cocke, Kimberly Sue
7193 West Anton Way
New Palestine, Indiana 46163 / US
04 / Lemke, Stephanie Jean
11336 Echo Bridge Lane
Indianapolis, Indiana 46236 / US
[1997/31]
Representative(s)Hudson, Christopher Mark , et al
Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/31]Hudson, Christopher Mark , et al
Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
Application number, filing date97300537.429.01.1997
[1997/31]
Priority number, dateUS1996001078129.01.1996         Original published format: US 10781
[1997/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0786523
Date:30.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0786523
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/12, C12Q1/48
[2000/01]
Former International [1997/31]C12N15/54, C12N9/12, C12Q1/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/31]
Extension statesAL10.02.1997
LT10.02.1997
LV10.02.1997
RO10.02.1997
SI10.02.1997
TitleGerman:Proteinkinase und Verfahren zur Verwendung[1997/31]
English:Protein kinase and method of using[1997/31]
French:Kinase de protéine et procédé d'utilisation[1997/31]
Examination procedure10.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
13.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/09]
11.08.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]  CHEN Y ET AL, "Aberrant subcellular localization of BRCA1 in breast cancer", SCIENCE, (19951103), vol. 270, no. 5237, pages 789 - 791, XP002122303 [X] 1 * figure 1A *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.270.5237.789
 [PX]  CHEN Y ET AL, "BRCA1 IS A 220-KDA NUCLEAR PHOSPHOPROTEIN THAT IS EXPRESSED AND PHOSPHORYLATED IN A CELL CYCLE-DEPENDENT MANNER", CANCER RESEARCH, (19960715), vol. 56, no. 14, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3168 - 3172, XP002050110 [PX] 1-9 * figure 4 *
 [A]  SMITH D ET AL, "Modified glutathione S-transferase fusion proteins for simplified analysis of protein-protein interactions", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH., OXFORD GB, (19930125), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 359 - 360, XP002122328
by applicantUS4617149
 US5242688
 US4935350
 US5000000
 US4840896
 US4889818