Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0787837

EP0787837 - Method for feeding granular silicon material, feed pipe used in the method, and method of manufacturing a silicon monocrystal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED
4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/32]For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED
4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagai, Naoki
D-402, 3-13-37, Isobe
Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
02 / Harada, Isamu
B 336-5, Furuya
Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
03 / Tashiro, Chihiro
B-302, 787-2 Yanase
Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
04 / Oda, Michiaki
3318-12 Itahana
Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
[1997/32]
Representative(s)Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/32]Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company, Chartered Patent Agents, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date97300713.105.02.1997
[1997/32]
Priority number, dateJP1996004670108.02.1996         Original published format: JP 4670196
JP1996008882818.03.1996         Original published format: JP 8882896
[1997/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0787837
Date:06.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0787837
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:C30B15/02
[1997/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/32]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Zuführen granulierten Siliziums, Zuführungsleitung dafür, und Verfahren zur Herstellung Silizium-Einkristallen[1997/32]
English:Method for feeding granular silicon material, feed pipe used in the method, and method of manufacturing a silicon monocrystal[1997/32]
French:Procédé pour l'alimentation de silicium granulé, tuyau d'alimentation pour ce procédé et méthode de production de silicium monocristallin[1997/32]
Examination procedure14.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/41]
25.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2001Fee for grant paid
11.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.05.2001
GB05.02.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2003/01]FR21.12.2001
GB05.02.2002
Former [2002/18]FR21.12.2001
Documents cited:Search[PXD]EP0712945  (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [PXD] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5419462  (JOHNSTON STEVEN W [US], et al) [X] 13 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 8 *;
 [A]EP0315156  (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5242667  (KOZIOL JUREK K [US], et al)