Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0790260

EP0790260 - Solid catalyst components for polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAPAN POLYOLEFINS CO., LTD.
26-5, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1997/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Takahashi, Hirotoshi
2, Ohaza-Nakanosu
Ohita-shi, Ohita / JP
02 / Kuroda, Yasushi
5-1, Ohgi-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Fushimi, Masaki
2, Ohaza-Nakanosu
Ohita-shi, Ohita / JP
04 / Inazawa, Shintarou
2, Ohaza-Nakanosu
Ohita-shi, Ohita / JP
 [2002/28]
Former [1997/34]01 / Takahashi, Hirotoshi
2, Ohaza-Nakanosu
Ohita-shi, Ohita / JP
02 / Kuroda, Yusushi
5-1, Ohgi-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Fushimi, Masaki
2, Ohaza-Nakanosu
Ohita-shi, Ohita / JP
04 / Inazawa, Shintarou
2, Ohaza-Nakanosu
Ohita-shi, Ohita / JP
Representative(s)Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Former [1997/34]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen , et al
Mathys & Squire, 100 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date97300977.214.02.1997
[1997/34]
Priority number, dateJP1996002880116.02.1996         Original published format: JP 2880196
[1997/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0790260
Date:20.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0790260
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/00, C08F4/654
[1997/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/34]
TitleGerman:Feste Katalysatorbestandteile für die Polymerisation[1997/34]
English:Solid catalyst components for polymerization[1997/34]
French:Composants catalytiques solides pour la polymérisation[1997/34]
Examination procedure20.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/47]
22.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
29.08.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2002Fee for grant paid
01.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Request for further processing for:03.11.2000Request for further processing filed
03.11.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.11.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0570267  (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [X] 1-9,10 * page 8; examples 10,11 * * page 9; example 16 *;
 [X]EP0488856  (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * page 7; example 8 * * page 8; examples 12,14 *;
 [PX]EP0717052  (APPRYL SNC [FR]) [PX] 1-10 * page 6; example 1 * * claims 1,3,6,8-11-14,19,21 *;
 [X]EP0099773  (BP CHIMIE SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * page 6 - page 7; example 1 * * page 10 - page 11; example 6 *;
 [X]EP0415588  (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,7,9,4,5 * page 8 - page 10; examples 1,2,4 * * example 3 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [X]US4384984  (MINK ROBERT I, et al) [X] 1-3,6-10 * claims 1,6-11,14,27 * * column 6; examples 1,2 *;
 [X]JPS5959708
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840719), vol. 008, no. 156, Database accession no. (C - 234), [X] 1-3,9 * abstract *