Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0796970

EP0796970 - A door anti-rattle assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROVER GROUP LIMITED
International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park
Warwick CV34 6RG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/39]For all designated states
Rover Group Limited
International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park
Warwick CV34 6RG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Tidbury, John
26 Ferny Close, Radley
Abingdon, Oxfordshire, OX14 3AN / GB
02 / Mistry, Dilip
70 Blenheim Drive
Bicester, Oxfordshire, OX6 8NQ / GB
[1997/39]
Representative(s)Schernhammer, Herbert , et al
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Patentabteilung AJ-5
80788 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]Schernhammer, Herbert , et al
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3
80788 München / DE
Former [1997/39]Burrage, David John , et al
Rover Group Limited Patent Department Gaydon Test Centre Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Application number, filing date97301493.905.03.1997
[1997/39]
Priority number, dateGB1996000594221.03.1996         Original published format: GB 9605942
[1997/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0796970
Date:24.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0796970
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:E05F7/04, E05F5/00
[1997/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [1999/51]
Former [1997/39]DE,  ES,  FR,  IT 
TitleGerman:Zusammenbau zum Verhindern des Klappern einer Tür[1997/39]
English:A door anti-rattle assembly[1997/39]
French:Montage procurant une protection contre le battement d'une porte[1997/39]
Examination procedure14.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/12]
23.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1999Fee for grant paid
11.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1070524  (DAIMLER-BENZ) [A] 1,2,5,6,8-10 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 10; figure - *;
 [A]US1447271  (JOSEPH SOSS) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 62 - line 105; figure - *;
 [A]US1891289  (THOMAS HORACE T) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 51 - line 53 * * page 2, line 60 - line 64 * * page 3, line 5 - line 60; figure - *