Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0795299

EP0795299 - Trigger mechanism for surgical instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2001 [2001/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH 45242-2839 / US
[1997/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Witt, David A.
9544 Carroll Court
Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US
02 / Nicola, Kirk M.
8150 Autumm Lane
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
03 / Cook, Robert G.
5274 Bay Pointe Drive
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
04 / Hueil, Joseph C.
11611 Thistlehill Drive
Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US
05 / Flaker, Richard W.
448 Magie Avenue
Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US
[1997/38]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/38]Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97301644.712.03.1997
[1997/38]
Priority number, dateUS1996061441512.03.1996         Original published format: US 614415
[1997/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0795299
Date:17.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0795299
Date:12.08.1998
[1998/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0795299
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/072
[1997/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/38]
TitleGerman:Ausstossmechanismus für chirurgisches Instrument[1997/38]
English:Trigger mechanism for surgical instrument[1997/38]
French:Mécanisme de déclenchement pour un instrument chirurgical[1997/38]
Examination procedure19.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/11]
01.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.1999Fee for grant paid
30.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0539762  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1 * column 12, line 22 - line 45; figures 5,7-12 *;
 [A]EP0674876  (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US])