blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0866199

EP0866199 - Locking mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Persiano, Anthony M.
160 Bellmawr Manor Bellmawr
New Jersey 08031 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
Persiano, Anthony M.
160 Bellmawr Manor
Bellmawr, New Jersey 08031 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/39]
Representative(s)Molyneaux, Martyn William
Ladas & Parry
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]Molyneaux, Martyn William
c/o Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date97301778.317.03.1997
[1998/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0866199
Date:23.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0866199
Date:16.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.1997
ClassificationIPC:E05C3/10, E05B63/02, E05B9/08
[1998/39]
CPC:
E05B9/08 (EP,US); E05B17/2057 (EP,US); E05B63/0013 (EP,US);
E05B63/02 (EP,US); E05C3/10 (EP,US); E05B15/006 (EP,US);
E05B17/04 (EP,US); E05B65/0028 (EP,US); Y10T292/1075 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5217 (EP,US); Y10T70/5363 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/39]
TitleGerman:Verriegelungsmechanismus[1998/39]
English:Locking mechanism[1998/39]
French:Mécanisme de verrouillage[1998/39]
Examination procedure11.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/19]
14.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2003Fee for grant paid
14.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28]
Request for further processing for:14.12.2001Request for further processing filed
14.12.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.01.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
09.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR16.07.2003
DE17.10.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/31]DE17.10.2003
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2014230  (BRINK LOCKING SYST) [X] 1,5 * page 2, line 51 - page 7, column 71, line - * [A] 2,3,6-8,11;
 [XA]DE3521392  (SCHULTE C E GMBH [DE]) [X] 2,3 * page 13, line 15 - page 18, line 21; figure - * [A] 1,5-7;
 [XA]CH277919  (INGERSOLL LIMITED [GB]) [X] 2 * page 1, line 19 - page 4, line 25; figure - * [A] 1,3,5-7;
 [XA]DE9411842U  (KIRCHMANN NIEDERDRENK KG [DE]) [X] 2 * page 7, line 7 - page 13, line 11; figure - * [A] 1,3,5,6,10;
 [A]DE2409824  (KIRCHMANN NIEDERDRENK KG) [A] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *;
 [E]US5622065  (PERSIANO ANTHONY M [US]) [E] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2903635  (WESTFAELISCHES METALLWERK) [A] 4,9 * page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 27; figure - *;
 [A]DE2126544  (HEMMEN) [A] 4,9 * page 5, line 15 - page 8, line 5; figure - *;
 [A]US3740979  (CREPINSEK A) [A] 4,9 * column 2, line 49 - column 6, line 44; figure - *;
 [A]GB1379175  (ADAMS RITE MFG) [A] 4,9 * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 122; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.