EP0818178 - Anchoring device for sealing percutaneous punctures in vessels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X-Site, L.L.C. 20 Campus Road Totowa New Jersey 07512 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states X-Site, L.L.C. 20 Campus Road Totowa, New Jersey 07512 / US | ||
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states Cardiologics, L.L.C. 20 Campus Road Totowa, New Jersey 07512 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kontos, Stavros 11 Bearbrook Drive Woodcliff Lake, New Jersey 07675 / US | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301833.6 | 19.03.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | US19960677288 | 09.07.1996 Original published format: US 677288 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0818178 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0818178 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0818178 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/12, A61B18/12 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00637 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00654 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00672 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/50] | A61B17/00, A61B17/12, A61B17/39 | ||
Former IPC [1998/03] | A61B17/00, A61B17/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/03] | Title | German: | Verankerungsgerät zum Abdichten von Gefässpunktionen | [1998/03] | English: | Anchoring device for sealing percutaneous punctures in vessels | [1998/03] | French: | Dispositif d'ancrage pour l'obturation de perforations vasculaires | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 05.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5496332 (SIERRA ROLANDO [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9321844 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,14,15 * figures 9-15,19 *; | [A]WO9505210 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]) [A] 14,15 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9222252 (ASHRIDGE AG [CH]); | [A]EP0604761 (GOLLIEZ BIO TEC LTD [CH]); | [PX]WO9639945 (DATASCOPE INVESTMENT CORP [US]) [PX] 1,7,11-13 * page 24, paragraph 2; figures 28-37 * |