blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0798318

EP0798318 - Process for controlling gas phase fluidized bed polymerization reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 08.09.2004  [2004/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury
Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Former [1997/40]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jacobsen, Lance Lyle
100 Scott Acres
Scott Depot, Virginia 25560 / US
02 / Lee, Kiu Hee
1002 Rustling Road
South Charleston, Virginia 25560 / US
03 / Parrish, John Roberts
5002 Demsey Drive
Cross Lanes, West Virginia 25313 / US
[1997/40]
Representative(s)Allard, Susan Joyce, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/40]Allard, Susan Joyce, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97302175.127.03.1997
[1997/40]
Priority number, dateUS1996062301628.03.1996         Original published format: US 623016
[1997/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0798318
Date:01.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0798318
Date:29.04.1998
[1998/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0798318
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.1998
ClassificationIPC:C08F210/16, C08F210/18, C08F210/06, C08F2/34
[1997/40]
CPC data not yet available
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT [1997/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Kontrolle eines Gasphasenpolymerisationsfliessbettreaktors[1997/40]
English:Process for controlling gas phase fluidized bed polymerization reactor[1997/40]
French:Procédé pour controller une réacteur à lit fluidisé à phase gazeuse[1997/40]
Examination procedure17.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/40]
15.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
08.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.1999Fee for grant paid
21.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
ES28.03.2000
PT26.04.2000
[2004/37]
Former [2004/07]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9324533  (AMOCO CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 4 *;
 [DA]DE4241530  (BUNA AG [DE]) [DA] 1,6,7,9-11 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 19 - line 64 *;
 [DA]  - MCAULEY, K.B.; MACGREGOR, J.F., "Optimal grade transitions in a gas phase polyethylene reactor", AICHE J., (1992), vol. 38, no. 10, pages 1564 - 1576, XP002056613 [DA] 1 * see pages 1569-1574 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aic.690381008
 [A]  - MCAULEY, K.B. ; MACGREGOR, J.F., "Nonlinear product property control in industrial gas-phase polyethylene reactors", AICHE J., (1993), vol. 39, no. 5, pages 855 - 866, XP002056614 [A] 1 * see pages 861-862 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aic.690390514
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.