Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0799709

EP0799709 - Image forming apparatus with controlled access [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lexmark International, Inc.
740 New Circle Road N.W.
Lexington, Kentucky 40511-1876 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/41]For all designated states
LEXMARK INTERNATIONAL, INC.
740 New Circle Road N.W.
Lexington, Kentucky 40511-1876 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cunnagin, Stephen Kelly
3228 Hunters Point Drive
Lexington, Kentucky 40515 / US
02 / Heydinger, Scott Michael
912 Cherrywood Drive
Lexington, Kentucky 40515 / US
[1997/41]
Representative(s)Tomlinson, Kerry John
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/41]Tomlinson, Kerry John
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date97302330.204.04.1997
[1997/41]
Priority number, dateUS1996062817704.04.1996         Original published format: US 628177
[1997/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0799709
Date:08.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0799709
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/505, G07F17/26
[1997/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/41]
TitleGerman:Bilderzeugungsgerät mit kontrolliertem Zugang[1997/41]
English:Image forming apparatus with controlled access[1997/41]
French:Appareil de formation d'images à accès contrôlé[1997/41]
Examination procedure05.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/06]
01.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1999Fee for grant paid
03.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0536050  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,19 * column 5, line 35 - column 14, line 58; figures 2,5,6 *;
 [A]EP0479051  (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [A] 1,19 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 13; figure 1 *