Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0802507

EP0802507 - Smart cards having thin die [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Clifton, Mark Bradford
18 Galston Drive
Robbinsville, New Jersey 08691 / US
02 / Verdi, Fred William
13 Larkspur Lane
Lawrenceville, New Jersey 08648 / US
03 / Flynn, Richard Michael
16524 Audubon Court
Noblesville, Indiana 46060 / US
[1997/43]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Intellectual Property Business Group
Christchurch Way
Greenwich
London SE10 0AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2005/25]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [1997/43]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date97302398.908.04.1997
[1997/43]
Priority number, dateUS1996063507219.04.1996         Original published format: US 635072
[1997/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0802507
Date:22.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0802507
Date:02.08.2000
[2000/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077
[1997/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/43]
TitleGerman:Chipkarten mit dünnem Chip[1997/43]
English:Smart cards having thin die[1997/43]
French:Cartes intelligentes à puce mince[1997/43]
Examination procedure04.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
05.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/34]
18.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
11.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
16.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200206   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.200610   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0676717  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 50 - column 7, line 29; figures 2-4 *;
 [EL]EP0772153  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [EL] 1-4 * claims 1-4 * * for priority reasons *