Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0805609

EP0805609 - Method and apparatus for tracking identity-code changes in a mobile communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation)
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto CA 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation)
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Former [2001/31]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies Inc.
a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc.
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [1997/45]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schiefer, Jan
7 Cotham Grove
Bristol BS6 6AL / GB
02 / Stephenson, David Arthur
7 Webbington Road
Chippenham, Wiltshire SN15 3GB / GB
03 / Bonner, David
45 Millburn Gardens
East Kilbridge G75 8RL / GB
04 / Bennett, Steven Nicholas
Bafford Farm, 40 Bafford Lane, Charlton Kings
Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL53 8DP / GB
[1997/45]
Representative(s)Coker, David Graeme , et al
Agilent Technologies UK Ltd
Legal Dept
Eskdale Road
Winnersh Triangle
Wokingham, Berks RG41 5DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Coker, David Graeme , et al
Agilent Technologies UK Ltd. Legal Department Eskdale Road Winnersh Triangle Wokingham
Berkshire RG41 5DZ / GB
Former [2000/13]Coker, David Graeme , et al
Agilent Technologies UK Ltd, Legal Department, M/S CSCA15, Eskdale Road Winnersh Triangle
Wokingham, Berks RG41 5DZ / GB
Former [1997/45]Coker, David Graeme , et al
Hewlett-Packard Limited Intellectual Property Section, Building 2, Filton Road
Bristol BS12 6QZ / GB
Application number, filing date97302937.430.04.1997
[1997/45]
Priority number, dateEP1996030314703.05.1996         Original published format: EP 96303147
[1997/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0805609
Date:05.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0805609
Date:25.08.1999
[1999/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0805609
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/34
[1997/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [1997/45]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Verfolgen der Änderung des Identifizierungskodes in einem mobilen Kommunikationssystem[1997/45]
English:Method and apparatus for tracking identity-code changes in a mobile communications system[1997/45]
French:Procédé et appareil pour suivi du changement des codes d'identités dans un réseau de communication mobile[1997/45]
Examination procedure24.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
29.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
17.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
24.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2003Fee for grant paid
15.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI17.03.2004
SE17.06.2004
[2004/40]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0710043  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,19 * column 9, line 23 - column 10, line 9 * * figure 4 *
 [A]  FINGERLE B-M, "GSM SIGNALISIERUNG IN DER PRAXIS", ITG-FACHBERICHT, NEU-ULM, DE, (199309), no. 124, pages 423 - 432, XP000534209 [A] 1,2,4,13,18,19 * page 427, line 10 - page 431, line 9 * * figures 5,6,8 *
ExaminationEP0805608