blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0806672 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0806672



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 127
24.09.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
15.05.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
29.04.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 1
15.01.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.07.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
21.06.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.05.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.03.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
14.03.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.03.2000 European search report Search / examination 2
06.07.1999 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
15.09.1997 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
10.07.1997 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
01.07.1997 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
16.06.1997 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.06.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.06.1997 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.06.1997 Priority document Search / examination 62
06.05.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.05.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
06.05.1997 Description Search / examination 16
06.05.1997 Drawings Search / examination 14
06.05.1997 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
06.05.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6